Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Agency, Department of Transportation, and Department of the Environment – Study on Historic and Recent Flooding in Prince George’s County PG 407–21
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Emergency Management Agency, the Department of Transportation, and the Department of the Environment to study flooding in Prince George's County; requiring that the study analyze, evaluate, and examine certain information, measures, and issues; requiring that the study develop certain recommendations; requiring the Agency, the Department of Transportation, and the Department of the Environment to report the findings and recommendations, on or before October 15, 2021, to certain individuals and entities; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Emergency Management Agency, Department of Transportation, and Department of the Environment – Study on Historic and Recent Flooding in Prince George’s County PG 407–21
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page