Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Student Information – United States Census Bureau
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governing Board of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center to authorize the Center to send student information to the United States Census Bureau.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0444
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-19)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Student Information – United States Census Bureau
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Student Information – United States Census Bureau
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (114-19) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Returned Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page