Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore East–West Corridor – Transit Study – Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Smith, Attar, and Bridges
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Transportation, contingent on the receipt of federal funds, to promptly undertake all steps necessary to complete the design, engineering, and National Environmental Policy Act process and secure a record of decision for the Red Line transit project and a MARC rail extension to the Johns Hopkins Bayview Medical Center; requiring the Department to prepare a plan for the funding and financing of the construction and operation of the Red Line transit project and MARC rail extension; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore East–West Corridor – Transit Study – Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433320/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore East–West Corridor – Transit Study – Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-33)
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963227/1
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {653928/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-37)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore East–West Corridor – Transit Study – Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore East–West Corridor – Transit Study – Requirements
House 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments {433320/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore East–West Corridor – Transit Study – Requirements
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Third Reading Passed (96-33) 34AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {963227/1 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator McCray) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {963227/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Floor Amendment {653928/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-37) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore East–West Corridor – Transit Study – Requirements
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   2006, 2009 )
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page