Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each school district to adopt or update a school district energy policy beginning July 1, 2022; specifying the contents of a school district energy policy; encouraging school districts to set targets to increase the school district's use of renewable energy and reduce the school district's greenhouse gas emissions; requiring that a school district energy policy be posted on the school district's website and updated every 3 years; requiring the development of a certain standardized reporting template for school districts; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2021
Legislative Date
1/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {774167/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-40)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
House 1/23/2021 1/23/2021 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Reassigned to Appropriations 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {774167/1 Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (99-40) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 39AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Text - Chapter - Primary and Secondary Education – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
(   5-312.1 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page