Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Renewable Energy Credits - Offshore Wind
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the application of the offshore wind energy component of the renewable energy portfolio standard to apply only to distribution sales of electric companies; altering the manner in which an electric company may reflect and recover offshore wind renewable energy credit costs; altering certain compliance fees for shortfalls from the offshore wind energy component of the renewable energy portfolio standard; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0526
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Offshore Wind Renewable Energy Credits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-31)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {583120/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Hershey and Augustine)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity - Offshore Wind Renewable Energy Credits
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {703325/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Renewable Energy Credits - Offshore Wind
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (100-31) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Floor Amendment {583120/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Hershey and Augustine) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page