Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Prohibited Behavior on School Grounds and Property - Application
Sponsored by
Delegates Ruth, Allen, Amprey, Bartlett, Charkoudian, Fair, Feldmark, Guyton, Hill, Lehman, R. Lewis, McCaskill, Mireku-North, Pasteur, Phillips, Simpson, Taveras, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that provisions of law prohibiting and penalizing certain disruptive and threatening behavior on certain school grounds and property do not apply to students who commit offenses at the institution they attend or students who commit offenses at another institution while participating in or attending a sporting event or other extracurricular program sponsored at that institution.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0512
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1114 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 02/28 (Delegate M. Morgan) Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {853524/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (38-95)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-38)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Prohibited Behavior on School Grounds and Property - Application
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Motion Special Order until 02/28 (Delegate M. Morgan) Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Floor Amendment {853524/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (38-95) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Prohibited Behavior on School Grounds and Property - Application
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (94-38) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:03 PM
Click to return on the top page