Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer – Alterations PG 503–21
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Prince George's County Board of Education to require all members to be elected; providing that any elected member who no longer resides in Prince George's County may not continue to serve on the board; repealing provisions relating to the appointed members the Board; requiring members of the county board to be elected by the voters of the entire county; repealing provisions establishing the county superintendent as the Chief Executive Officer of the Prince George's County public school system; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2021
Legislative Date
1/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George’s County – Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer – Alterations PG 503–21
House 1/23/2021 1/23/2021 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:43 PM
Click to return on the top page