Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Families Serve Act of 2024
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Allen, Amprey, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Boafo, Buckel, Charkoudian, Conaway, Crutchfield, Edelson, Fennell, Foley, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Griffith, Grossman, Guyton, Guzzone, Harris, Henson, Hill, Jackson, A. Johnson, S. Johnson, D. Jones, Kaufman, Lopez, Love, McCaskill, Mireku-North, T. Morgan, Munoz, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Pruski, Roberts, Rogers, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Spiegel, Taveras, Taylor, Tomlinson, Turner, Valderrama, White Holland, Williams, and Wu
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing employers to grant a preference in hiring and promotion to spouses of eligible service members; and requiring the appointing authorities in the Executive Branch of State government to apply a credit of 10 points on any selection test for eligible military spouses and veterans of uniformed services.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0478
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Families Serve Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Families Serve Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Families Serve Act of 2024
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {853527/1 Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Families Serve Act of 2024
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Finance 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments {993127/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2024 3/11/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:03 PM
Click to return on the top page