Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Professional Athlete Funding Act
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing certain requirements for certain player brand agreements between certain professional athletes and certain investors; establishing that player brand agreements that comply with requirements of the Act are valid, binding, and enforceable contracts notwithstanding certain laws; providing that the Attorney General and the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General have certain authority to enforce the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0512
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Professional Athlete Funding Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Law - Professional Athlete Funding Act
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-1701 through 11-1706 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:41 PM
Click to return on the top page