Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Fisher, J. Lewis, Feldmark, Foley, Harrison, Lehman, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Toles, Wilkins, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland; providing that the purpose of the Workgroup is to identify the appropriate State agency to operate a vulnerable adult registry, identify how a $1,400,000 grant from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services was allocated and used, if awarded, and study and make recommendations regarding any changes or improvements to State law; and requiring a report of the Workgroup's recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by June 1, 2023.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0357
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1281 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {643420/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Adult Protective Services – Vulnerable Adults Registry – Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {643420/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page