Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Police – Collective Bargaining – Supervisors and Sergeants
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young and Ebersole
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 47
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding sergeants and supervisors within the Maryland Transit Administration Police to the list of employees authorized to participate in collective bargaining with the Maryland Transit Administration.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0475
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983924/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-34)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-32)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Overridden (98-40)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Overridden (31-14)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 47
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration Police – Collective Bargaining – Supervisors and Sergeants
House 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {983924/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration Police – Collective Bargaining – Supervisors and Sergeants
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (97-34) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Finance 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments {653428/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (99-32) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Transit Administration Police – Collective Bargaining – Supervisors and Sergeants
Post Passage 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Overridden (98-40) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Overridden (31-14) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 47
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transit Administration Police – Collective Bargaining – Supervisors and Sergeants
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page