Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Labor to adopt certain regulations, on or before October 1, 2021, relating to housing, accommodations, safety, health, rights, and welfare of H-2A and H-2B visa and migrant workers during the COVID-19 pandemic.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act)
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:41 PM
Click to return on the top page