Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment Programs
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates S. Johnson, Allen, Alston, Amprey, Anderton, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Boafo, Bouchat, Boyce, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Ebersole, Fennell, Foley, Forbes, Grossman, Guyton, Guzzone, Harris, Harrison, Henson, Hill, Hornberger, Jackson, A. Johnson, D. Jones, Kaiser, Kaufman, Kipke, J. Long, Lopez, Love, Martinez, McCaskill, Munoz, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Pruski, Roberson, Roberts, Ruff, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Spiegel, Taveras, Taylor, Toles, Tomlinson, Turner, Valderrama, Watson, Williams, Wu, R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Chisholm, Hutchinson, Kerr, M. Morgan, Rosenberg, White Holland, Woods, Reilly, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a psychiatric nurse practitioner to evaluate an emergency evaluee for purposes of involuntary admission; authorizing each county to establish an assisted outpatient treatment program by July 1, 2026; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish an assisted outpatient treatment program in a county that does not opt to establish the program by July 1, 2026; requiring the Office of the Public Defender to provide representation in assisted outpatient treatment proceedings; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0453
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024, July 1, 2025
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Mental Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment Programs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Mental Health - Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission Procedures and Assisted Outpatient Treatment Programs
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {493424/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mental Health - Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission Procedures and Assisted Outpatient Treatment Programs
House 2/29/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Referred Finance 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {113623/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Mental Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment Programs
(   10-6A-01 through 10-6A-12 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:49 AM
Click to return on the top page