Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Policies on Bullying, Harassment, or Intimidation - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Crutchfield, McCaskill, Pasteur, Stein, and Vogel
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain requirements for a model policy prohibiting bullying, harassment, or intimidation in public and nonpublic schools; requiring that notification to the parent or guardian of the alleged victim be at the discretion of the alleged victim, if the act of bullying, harassment, or intimidation is determined to be motivated by the alleged victim's actual or perceived sex, sexual orientation, or gender identity; prohibiting certain school employees from being held civilly liable under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0629
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2023
Legislative Date
2/08/2023
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate McComas) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {313928/1 (Delegate McComas)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Reznik) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) Rejected (39-98)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-34)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Policies on Bullying, Harassment, or Intimidation - Revisions
House 2/08/2023 2/08/2023 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Favorable with Amendments {143727/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate McComas) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Floor Amendment {313928/1 (Delegate McComas) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Reznik) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) Rejected (39-98) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education - Policies on Bullying, Harassment, or Intimidation - Revisions
House 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Third Reading Passed (103-34) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page