Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees - Four-Day Workweek - Implementation
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart and Hornberger
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before October 1, 2025, the Department of Budget and Management to identify units of State government or functions of State government for which a transition to a 4-day workweek is feasible for 60% of State employees; requiring the Department to implement a 4-day workweek for certain State employees by October 1, 2027; and prohibiting State employees who transition to a 4-day workweek from, as a direct result of the transition, having work hours reduced to less than 36 hours per week or having a reduction in pay or benefits.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0569
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Employees - Four-Day Workweek - Implementation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employees - Four-Day Workweek - Implementation
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:01 PM
Click to return on the top page