Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain local governments to allow, by law, a first-time homebuyer in the State to calculate the homestead property tax credit for property that includes a newly purchased dwelling using a certain method; requiring that the credit for a newly purchased dwelling be calculated in a certain manner; providing that a certain homeowner may receive the larger of the homestead property tax credit amounts as calculated using certain methods; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0411 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:40 PM
Click to return on the top page