Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Carr, Hill, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding a representative of a skilled trade organization and a representative of a career college to the list of members who must be selected for the Career and Technical Education Committee; altering the Committee's duties to include the perspective of career colleges and skilled trade organizations; requiring the Committee to develop a list of all skilled trade organization programs and career programs; transferring the Committee from the Governor's Workforce Development Board to an independent unit in the Department of Labor; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0478
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553823/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {553823/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Referred Rules 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page