Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority - Federal Health Emergency
Sponsored by
Delegate Pendergrass
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to adopt regulations that may be applied when a national or public health emergency that affects the State is issued by the President of the United States or the Secretary of Health and is based on a serious health threat resulting from the existence of a certain deadly agent; and requiring that a carrier that issues Medicare supplement policies establish a special enrollment period for individuals enrolled in Medicare Part B and the Maryland Medical Assistance Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority - Federal Health Emergency
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority - Federal Health Emergency
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-10)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority - Federal Health Emergency
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {593521/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority - Federal Health Emergency
House 3/04/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (119-10) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Finance 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495
Text - Chapter - Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority - Federal Health Emergency
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page