Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trails Advisory Committee and the Maryland Office of Trails - Establishment (Great Maryland Trails Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Office of Trails in the Department of Transportation to develop and maintain the Maryland Trails Network, advance the development, maintenance, and use of trails in the State, develop a certain inventory and database, and collect certain information regarding trails; establishing a Director of the Maryland Office of Trails to oversee the Office and collaborate with the Bicycle and Pedestrian Advisory Committee; establishing the Maryland Trails Advisory Commission; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0645
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Trails Advisory Committee and the Maryland Office of Trails - Establishment (Great Maryland Trails Act)
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-901 through 2-904 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:00 PM
Click to return on the top page