Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Supported Decision Making
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Carey, Love, Saab, Shetty, Terrasa, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the use of supported decision making to assist an adult through the provision of certain support for the adult in making, communicating, or effectuating certain decisions and preventing the need for the appointment of certain substitute decision makers for the adult; Recognizing the right of an adult to enter into a supported decision-making agreement with one or more supporters under certain circumstances; providing immunity from civil or criminal liability under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0559
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Supported Decision Making
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Supported Decision Making
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Supported Decision Making
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513428/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Supported Decision Making
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
(   18-101 through 18-109 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page