Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation Claims - Fees for Legal Services
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Workers' Compensation Commission, if there is no compensation other than a medical benefit payable to a covered employee, to order that a fee of not more than $2,000 for legal services rendered on behalf of the covered employee be payable by the covered employee, an employer or its insurer, a self-insured employer, or the Uninsured Employers' Fund; exempting the ordered fee from the requirement that a fee approved by the Commission be a lien on compensation awarded; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0433
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation Claims - Fees for Legal Services
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page