Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty, Embry, Acevero, Anderton, Arikan, Attar, Atterbeary, Bagnall, Barnes, Bartlett, Boafo, Boyce, Chang, Charkoudian, Conaway, Crosby, Crutchfield, Cullison, Fair, Feldmark, Foley, Forbes, Grammer, Grossman, Guyton, Guzzone, D. Jones, Kaiser, Kaufman, R. Lewis, Lopez, Love, McCaskill, Mireku-North, Munoz, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Pena-Melnyk, Phillips, Roberson, Rosenberg, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Smith, Solomon, Spiegel, Stein, Taylor, Terrasa, Toles, Vogel, Wells, White Holland, Williams, Wolek, and Wu
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain facts to be considered when determining whether a lack of consent exists for the purposes of certain sexual crimes; and altering the elements of second-degree rape to remove the requirement of use of force or threat of force.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0758
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0412 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {833428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force
House 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments {193621/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2024 3/26/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 3/26/2024 3/26/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/26/2024 3/26/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Favorable with Amendments {833428/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page