Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Feldmark, Hill, Luedtke, and Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public school from prohibiting a student from organizing or participating in a student-organized peaceful demonstration, imposing certain limits on a student's right to free speech while participating in a student-organized peaceful demonstration, or disciplining a student for organizing or participating in a student-organized peaceful demonstration under certain circumstances; requiring each county board to develop a written policy regarding student-organized peaceful demonstrations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0519
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0753 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {693124/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (41-91)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-40)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {693124/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (41-91) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (96-40) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-311 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page