Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Bridges, Cardin, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, Feldmark, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Ivey, Kelly, Lehman, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Palakovich Carr, Queen, Reznik, Ruth, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Wilkins, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition against a person using or possessing with intent to use, delivering or selling under certain circumstances, or manufacturing or possessing with intent to deliver or sell under certain circumstances drug paraphernalia to inject, ingest, inhale, or otherwise introduce into the human body a controlled dangerous substance; altering a prohibition against a person possessing or distributing controlled paraphernalia under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0509
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0372 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923522/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {923522/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page