Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Management Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Barve
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a requirement that the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System provide a quarterly estimate of certain external investment management services; prohibiting the Board of Trustees from incurring fees for external investment management services that exceed 0.2% of the market value of invested assets as of the last day of the preceding fiscal year; exempting from the prohibition certain fees incurred under a contract entered into on or before June 30, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1254 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Management Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Management Fees
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:38 PM
Click to return on the top page