Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the purpose of the Enterprise Zone Program is to attract, retain, and encourage commercial development in economically distressed areas of the State by incentivizing capital investment and job creation through real property and income tax credits; requiring each county in which an enterprise zone is located to submit a certain report to the Department of Commerce by September 15 each year; requiring the Department to develop formal metrics and a framework for analyzing each enterprise zone; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0805 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-4)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683124/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-4) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments {823221/1 Adopted 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page