Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Undocumented Students - Out-of-State Tuition Exemption Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegates Pasteur, Taveras, Addison, Allen, Ebersole, Fair, Jackson, Phillips, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, and Taylor
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, from 3 years to 2 years, the number of years before an academic year for which an individual or the individual's parent or guardian must file taxes to be eligible to receive an out-of-state tuition exemption.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0637
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Hartman) Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {953427/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-37)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Undocumented Students - Out-of-State Tuition Exemption Eligibility
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Hartman) Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Floor Committee Amendment {953427/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Undocumented Students - Out-of-State Tuition Exemption Eligibility
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (96-37) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:58 PM
Click to return on the top page