Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission – Demographic Data Collection – Parental Status
Sponsored by
Delegate Kerr
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to collect certain data regarding the parental status of students from each public institution of higher education in the State; requiring public institutions of higher education to collect and report certain demographic data from students; and requiring the Commission to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by September 1, 2025, and each September 1 thereafter, a report summarizing the data collected.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Higher Education Commission – Demographic Data Collection – Parental Status
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
(   11-409 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:58 PM
Click to return on the top page