Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Net Energy Metering and Generating Capacity
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the maximum generating capacity of a community solar energy generating system for purposes of net energy metering; increasing the maximum generating capacity of a community solar energy generating system from 2 megawatts to 5 megawatts; and specifying that a community solar energy generating system is not a generating station if the generating capacity of the community solar energy generating system does not exceed 2 megawatts.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0110
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573329/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-40)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity – Community Solar Energy Generating Systems – Generating Capacity
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {573329/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Net Energy Metering and Generating Capacity
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (90-40) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Finance 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Text - Chapter - Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Net Energy Metering and Generating Capacity
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page