Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Working Marylanders Tax Relief Act of 2022
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Anderton, Boteler, Chisholm, Griffith, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Kipke, Kittleman, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Munoz, Novotny, Otto, Reilly, Saab, Szeliga, Thiam, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022, the percentage of the federal earned income tax credit used for determining the amount that an individual may claim as a refund under the Maryland earned income tax credit under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0404
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Working Marylanders Tax Relief Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Working Marylanders Tax Relief Act of 2022
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page