Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Mechanical Insulation Installation Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, B. Barnes, Henson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Ruth, and Stewart
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Mechanical Insulation Installation Grant Program in the Maryland Energy Administration to provide grants to individuals, nonprofit organizations, and business entities for a portion of certain qualified expenses paid or incurred for the installation of certain mechanical insulation in a certain manner on certain types of property; and establishing the Mechanical Insulation Installation Grant Fund to provide grants to eligible applicants and pay for the administrative costs of the Program.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0314
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0982 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax – Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-22)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax – Mechanical Insulation Installation Tax Credit
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {223024/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Energy Administration- Mechanical Insulation Installation Grant Program
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (114-22) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page