Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Woods, Alston, Anderton, Bagnall, Boafo, Chang, Crutchfield, Cullison, Davis, Harris, Harrison, Healey, Henson, Ivey, Kaufman, Kerr, J. Long, McCaskill, Pasteur, Pena-Melnyk, Roberson, Roberts, Simpson, Taveras, Taylor, Turner, Valderrama, Wilkins, Williams, Cardin, Toles, Schmidt, Phillips, and Conaway
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement agency or fire, rescue, or emergency medical services entity that receives a certain request for a wellness check of an individual to conduct a wellness check or submit a request for the relevant law enforcement agency or fire, rescue, or emergency medical services entity to conduct a wellness check without unreasonable delay.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0190
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283627/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Williams, Kaufman and Valentine)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Williams, Kaufman and Valentine)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Muse, McKay and Folden)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Muse, McKay and Folden)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Conference Committee Report {263323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Conference Committee Report {263323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Law Enforcement - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments {973829/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments {283627/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Williams, Kaufman and Valentine) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Williams, Kaufman and Valentine) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Senate Refuses Recede 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Muse, McKay and Folden) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Senate Refuses Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Muse, McKay and Folden) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Conference Committee Report {263323/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Conference Committee Report {263323/1 Adopted 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 12:18 PM
Click to return on the top page