Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adjusting the voting thresholds necessary for the Montgomery County Council or the Montgomery County District Council to take certain actions related to the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Text - Chapter - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page