Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission, by January 1, 2023, to establish an administrative process to approve supply offers for electricity or gas for households in the State that receive energy assistance through a program in the Office of Home Energy Programs; prohibiting, beginning on July 1, 2023, unless the Commission has approved the supply offer, a third-party retail supplier from offering to provide electricity or gas, renewing a certain contract, or charging a certain fee to certain households in the State; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0031
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933296/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-38)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {933296/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-38) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Referred Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636
Text - Chapter - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:15 PM
Click to return on the top page