Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Denial of Claims - Notice
Sponsored by
Delegate Watson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the means by which the State Treasurer may send notice of a denial of a claim made under the Maryland Tort Claims Act to authorize notice by e-mail or, if it is the only available means, by regular mail.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0150
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Denial of Claims - Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2023
Legislative Date
2/01/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2023
Legislative Date
2/25/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Denial of Claims - Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Denial of Claims - Notice
House 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2023 2/01/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2023 2/27/2023 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/28/2023 2/25/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Denial of Claims - Notice
House 3/02/2023 2/27/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Referred Judicial Proceedings 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/6/2023 11:35 AM
Click to return on the top page