Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland - Harford Memorial Hospital Closure - Economic Impact Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Johnson and Lisanti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the University of Maryland Institute for Governmental Service and Research to conduct a study on the economic impact of the closure of Harford Memorial Hospital in Havre de Grace and the transfer of its services to another location; requiring the Institute to conduct the study in a certain manner; requiring the Institute to develop a revitalization plan for Havre de Grace in a certain manner; requiring the Institute to report certain findings and information to certain committees on or before December 1, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/23/2020
Legislative Date
10/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/23/2020 10/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - University of Maryland - Harford Memorial Hospital Closure - Economic Impact Study
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:35 PM
Click to return on the top page