Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies – Repeal and Notification Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "owner" to repeal the exclusion of motor vehicle rental companies as owners of motor vehicles for the purpose of enforcing violations of entering an intersection against a red signal indication that are recorded by a traffic control signal monitoring system; requiring an agency to provide a certain notice to a motor vehicle rental company before issuing a citation for a violation recorded by a traffic control monitoring system; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/08/2020
Legislative Date
8/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/08/2020 8/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies – Repeal and Notification Requirement
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   21-202.1 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:35 PM
Click to return on the top page