Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Licensee Hours of Operation and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, R. Lewis, and Lierman
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a holder of a Class A license, a Class B-D-7 license, or an adult entertainment license issued by the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City from operating in a certain area in Baltimore City later than 10 p.m. unless the holder takes certain security measures; and requiring the Downtown Commercial District Authority to enter into a contract with the Baltimore Police Department for the hiring of two police officers to exclusively patrol certain areas at a certain time on certain days.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0222
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Licensee Hours of Operation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments {753922/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Licensee Hours of Operation and Enforcement
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (122-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Referred Rules 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 4/06/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page