Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Comptroller - Legal Division and Private Letter Ruling Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Legal Division in the Office of the Comptroller to provide expanded and detailed tax guidance to taxpayers and perform other duties relating to private letter rulings as assigned by the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to issue certain private letter rulings on the request of a person, except under certain circumstances; requiring the Comptroller when denying a private letter ruling request to provide the requestor with written reasons for the denial and to do so within 60 days after the request submission; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0477
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783326/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-14)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Office of the Comptroller - Legal Division and Private Letter Ruling Procedures
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {783326/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Office of the Comptroller - Legal Division and Private Letter Ruling Procedures
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (116-14) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-1A-01 through 13-1A-05, 2-102.1 )
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page