Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing certain vendors who are qualified job training organizations to claim a credit for the expense of collecting and paying the sales and use tax; prohibiting, for any calendar year, the total amount of credits a vendor may claim from exceeding $100,000; requiring a vendor to be certified as a qualified job training organization before claiming a certain credit; authorizing a vendor to submit an application to the Secretary of Labor to be certified as a qualified job training organization; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0257
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0594 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {765362/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {765362/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
(   11-105 )
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:30 PM
Click to return on the top page