Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Kerr
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the holder of presumed abandoned property valued at $5,000 or more to send certain written notice to the apparent owner by certified mail, return receipt requested, rather than by first-class mail; requiring the holder of abandoned property valued at $5,000 or more to keep records relating to that property for at least 3 years; requiring that certain records be sufficient to allow a person who is able to recover the abandoned property to establish a tax basis; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/15/2020
Legislative Date
9/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/15/2020 9/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:33 PM
Click to return on the top page