Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Commission on Climate Change Membership - Addition
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Lehman, Love, Ruth, Stein, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding the Secretary of Emergency Management, or the Secretary's designee, and the Chair of the Public Service Commission, or the Chair's designee, as members of the Commission on Climate Change.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0337
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Commission on Climate Change Membership - Addition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203924/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Commission on Climate Change Membership - Addition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-28)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Commission on Climate Change Membership - Addition
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {203924/1 Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Commission on Climate Change Membership - Addition
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (113-28) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Returned Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/2/2024 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page