Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law which require the Maryland Higher Education Commission to collect and provide to the Maryland Longitudinal Data System identifying information on certain business licensees and students; requiring certain licensing authorities that issue occupational or professional licenses to make every effort to comply with the data requirements and implementation schedule of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System, and to transfer student data in accordance with the data security and safeguarding plan; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0850 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2020
Legislative Date
10/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-35)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2020 10/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (96-35) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:22 PM
Click to return on the top page