Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Comptroller - Online Payment Processing Portal
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to maintain an online payment processing portal on its website to track payments made to payees; requiring the payment processing portal to have certain capabilities; requiring the unit of State government responsible for making a payment to a payee to update the online payment processing portal when the status of a payment changes; authorizing the Comptroller to consult with the Department of Information Technology in developing the online payment processing portal; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0281
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Comptroller - Online Payment Processing Portal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Comptroller - Online Payment Processing Portal
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page