Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that certain regulations adopted by the Department of Juvenile Services governing juvenile care facilities and juvenile detention facilities include a requirement for the establishment, implementation, and revision of safety plans related to the persons in the care of the facility; requiring residential centers and group homes to establish, implement, and revise a certain safety plan; requiring regulations adopted by the Behavioral Health Administration to include a revision for safety plans every 5 years; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0003
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623421/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Facilities – Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care – Safety Plans
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {623421/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Referred Rules 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page