Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the time for the submission of the final report to December 1, 2023, of the Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission and extending the termination date for the Commission to June 30, 2024.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2020
Legislative Date
10/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956083/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2020 10/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Committee - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {956083/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Text - Chapter - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:19 PM
Click to return on the top page