Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Belcastro, Charkoudian, Forbes, Healey, Kaiser, Kerr, McComas, Reznik, Ruth, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kipke, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the 9-8-8 Trust Fund to provide reimbursement for costs associated with designating and maintaining 9-8-8 as the universal telephone number for a national suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to designate 9-8-8 as the primary phone number for the State's behavioral health crisis hotline; requiring the Department by December 1 each year to report on the expenditure of funds and additional services provided by the funding; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0241
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133625/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {133625/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Text - Chapter - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund
(   7.5-5A-01 through 7.5-5A-04 )
Last Updated: 7/26/2022 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page