Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational Licensing Boards and Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Reporting Disciplinary Activities
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring business occupation licensing boards to include on license, registration, and certification application and renewal forms an option for the applicant to provide the applicant's gender, race, and ethnicity; requiring the business occupation licensing boards to encourage applicants to provide gender, race, and ethnicity information; requiring business and health occupation licensing boards to include certain information related to disciplinary activities in the boards' annual reports; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0555
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Text - First - Occupational Licensing Boards and Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Reporting Disciplinary Activities
House 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page