Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hate Crimes – Civil Remedy
Sponsored by
Delegate Crutchfield
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is the victim of an act that would constitute a violation of certain hate crime laws may bring a civil action against the person or persons who committed the act in a court of competent jurisdiction; authorizing the court to impose an injunction and award certain economic and noneconomic damages; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0071
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0452 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hate Crimes – Civil Remedy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Hate Crimes – Civil Remedy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Hate Crimes – Civil Remedy
House 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hate Crimes – Civil Remedy
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-41) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
(   10-309 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page