Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretary of Health - Professional Qualification Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Amprey, Bagnall, Chang, Charles, Crutchfield, Cullison, Hill, Howell, Landis, Lehman, Ruth, Stewart, Valentino-Smith, and Williams
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to be professionally qualified through certain experience or education in at least one health-related field, health or law policy, health care facilities administration, health economics or financial management, government operations related to health care, or as a health care provider.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0243
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Secretary of Health - Professional Qualification Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Secretary of Health - Professional Qualification Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Secretary of Health - Professional Qualification Requirement
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Secretary of Health - Professional Qualification Requirement
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Finance 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page